MO HB462 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding delinquent tax collections by setting the maximum interest rate charged on delinquent tax payments at five percent and authorizes a waiver for certain property tax penalties
Title
Changes the law regarding delinquent tax collections by setting the maximum interest rate charged on delinquent tax payments at five percent and authorizes a waiver for certain property tax penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |