MO HB461 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the next-of-kin of a deceased person to delegate control of the final disposition of the remains.
Title
Authorizes the next-of-kin of a deceased person to delegate control of the final disposition of the remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 461 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 1:15pm, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 10:30am, or upon morning recess |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |