MO HB46 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Preserving Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act that prohibits the use of a drone or other aircraft to gather evidence or other information with specified exceptions
Title
Establishes the Preserving Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act that prohibits the use of a drone or other aircraft to gather evidence or other information with specified exceptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 24, 2013, 1:30PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee (S) - Re-referred to Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-04 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - NOES: 147 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 87 NOES: 66 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 TO HA 2, HA 2 AS AMENDED, HA 3 ADOPTED |
2013-04-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Agri-Business(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |