MO HB458 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-12HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-04-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2017-01-25HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback