MO HB451 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the requirement that all motor vehicles must obtain an inspection before the vehicle may be licensed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the requirement that all motor vehicles must obtain an inspection before the vehicle may be licensed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-03-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-27HouseTaken Up
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-18HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-03-13HousePerfected (H)
2019-03-13HouseHCS#2 Adopted (H)
2019-03-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-13HouseTaken Up
2019-03-07HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-06HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-04HouseRe-committed to Committee: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-04HouseMotion to Recommit Adopted - Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-03-04HouseMotion to Recommit
2019-03-04HouseTaken Up
2019-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-27HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-02-21HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-02-20HousePerfected (H)
2019-02-20HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-20HouseTaken Up
2019-02-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-12HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Downsizing State Government(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-01-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback