MO HB445 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits lobbyists from giving gifts to local government officials, with an exception for group gifts.
Title
Prohibits lobbyists from giving gifts to local government officials, with an exception for group gifts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House: HB 445 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: HB 445 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 118 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House: HB 445 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 118 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: HB 445 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2019, 9:45am, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuessday, April 9, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Government Reform(S) |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 to HA 2, HA 2 as anebded, HA 3, HA 1 to HA 6, HA 6 as amended, adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |