MO HB441 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Cronkite New Voices Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Cronkite New Voices Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - HB 441 (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-06SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2017-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-30SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 4, 2017, SCR 1
2017-03-28SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2017-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
2017-03-13HouseTaken Up
2017-03-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-03-07HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-03-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-03-07HouseTaken Up
2017-02-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-14HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-30HouseAction Postponed (H)
2017-01-30HouseExecutive Session Continued
2017-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2017-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback