MO HB422 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes property that may be exempt from execution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes property that may be exempt from execution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House - House: HB 422 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-12SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 13, 2017, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2017-02-23SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2017-02-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-20HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-20HouseTaken Up
2017-02-15HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-02-15HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-02-15HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-15HouseTaken Up
2017-02-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback