MO HB42 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elementary and secondary education
Title
Changes the laws regarding elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 110 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 84 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 85 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (*HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 35 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 40 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 84 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 85 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 42 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 113 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (*HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 35 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 40 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - HB 42 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 27 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 23 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 20 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2015-05-05 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 84 NOES: 73 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 71 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-05-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-04 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES WOOD, CIERPIOT, LAIR, PIERSON, CURTIS |
2015-04-20 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-20 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - PEARCE, SCHMITT, EMERY, CHAPPELLE-NADAL, HOLSMAN |
2015-04-20 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2015-04-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2015-04-16 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 1 to SA5, SA 5aa, SA 6, SA 7 AYES: 26 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 1 TO SA 5, SA 5 a.a., SA 6, SA 7 ADOPTED |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 2, 2015, 9:15am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 1, 2015, 3:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1, AMENDED |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 3:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-25 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 112 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 3 ADOPTED |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1, HCA 2, HCA 3, HCA 3 TO HCA 4, HCA 4 TO HCA 4, HCA 4 AS AMENDED, HCA 1 TO HCA 5, HCA 5 AS AMENDED, HCA 1 TO HCA 6, HCA 6 AS AMENDED, HCA 10 |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive Session - No Action Taken |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Education(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |