MO HB415 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the owner of a motor vehicle other than an apportioned motor vehicle or commercial motor vehicle licensed in excess of 24,000 pounds to apply for a special personalized license plate
Title
Allows the owner of a motor vehicle other than an apportioned motor vehicle or commercial motor vehicle licensed in excess of 24,000 pounds to apply for a special personalized license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 10 |
2013-04-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 ADOPTED |
2013-04-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |