MO HB410 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows physical therapists to treat patients without a prescription.
Title
Allows physical therapists to treat patients without a prescription.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 410 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: HB 410 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 34 N: 107 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House: HB 410 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 34 N: 107 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |