MO HB398 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a child-placing agency contracting with the state to provide foster care services from discriminating against a family because of the family's religion
Title
Prohibits a child-placing agency contracting with the state to provide foster care services from discriminating against a family because of the family's religion
Sponsors
Rep. Keri Ingle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |