MO HB398 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an electrical corporation to file a petition with the Missouri Public Service Commission to recover specified infrastructure replacement costs
Title
Allows an electrical corporation to file a petition with the Missouri Public Service Commission to recover specified infrastructure replacement costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |