MO HB397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regarding the protection of children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regarding the protection of children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 397 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 397 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 397 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 397 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: HB 397 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: HB 397 (HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: HB 397 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-16HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-16HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2019-05-14HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-14HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H)
2019-05-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-05-14HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H)
2019-05-14HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-09HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2019-05-08HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES COLEMAN(97), WOOD, FITZWATER, UNSICKER, MCCREERY
2019-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2019-05-08HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - RIDDLE, SATER, BROWN, WALSH, SCHUPP
2019-05-08HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2019-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-01HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2019-05-01HouseTaken Up
2019-05-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-29HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-04-29SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2019-04-29SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-29SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA1 adopted AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-29SenateTaken Up
2019-04-25SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-24SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-23SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-23SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS as amended, SA 1 adopted
2019-04-23SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-04-23SenateTaken Up
2019-04-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-04SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 27, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-02-14SenateSecond read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S)
2019-02-04HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-01-31HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-01-31HouseTaken Up
2019-01-30HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 adopted
2019-01-30HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-01-30HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-01-30HouseTaken Up
2019-01-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-01-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-01-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-24HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-01-24HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-01-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-01-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB397&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962S.05F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962H.08S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0962H.08T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/012.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/012.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/013.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay580429865-893.pdf#870
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback