MO HB395 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the department of natural resources to purchase a certain historic cemetery
Title
Authorizes the department of natural resources to purchase a certain historic cemetery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House: HB 395 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-05-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |