MO HB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the administrative procedures for driver's license suspensions and revocations.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the administrative procedures for driver's license suspensions and revocations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB383&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0070H.01I.pdf |