MO HB380 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the list of vehicles that may use or display fixed, flashing, or rotating red or red and blue lights
Title
Modifies the list of vehicles that may use or display fixed, flashing, or rotating red or red and blue lights
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House: HB 380 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 8:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-03-22 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-22 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |