MO HB368 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to Address Confidentiality Program
Title
Modifies provisions relating to Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB368&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0368I.PDF |