MO HB365 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: Local Government(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-08HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback