MO HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to a tax deduction for educator expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to a tax deduction for educator expenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2019-04-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback