MO HB364 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an employee of a fire protection or ambulance district to serve as a board member of a fire protection or ambulance district if the district is not in the same county where he or she is employed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows an employee of a fire protection or ambulance district to serve as a board member of a fire protection or ambulance district if the district is not in the same county where he or she is employed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2013-04-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-04HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-02-07HouseReferred: Local Government(H)
2013-01-31HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-01-30HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback