MO HB364 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the determination of a defendant's liability in a tort action for damages by specifying that the liability of each defendant for compensatory or punitive damages must be several and cannot be joint

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the determination of a defendant's liability in a tort action for damages by specifying that the liability of each defendant for compensatory or punitive damages must be several and cannot be joint

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-14 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-04-14 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-04-14 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-04-13 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2011-04-13 Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-04-12 Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-04-12 Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-03-16 Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H)
2011-03-16 Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H)
2011-03-16 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-02-21 Rules - No Action Taken (H)
2011-02-17 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2011-02-17 Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-02-17 Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-02-17 Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-02-17 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2011-02-08 Referred: General Laws (H)
2011-01-31 Read Second Time (H)
2011-01-27 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback