MO HB363 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Litigation Reform Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to actions for damages due to exposure to asbestos

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to actions for damages due to exposure to asbestos

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-18HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-08HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback