MO HB363 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-01-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback