MO HB359 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to concealed carry permits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to concealed carry permits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2021-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-25HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-22HouseAction Postponed (H)
2021-02-22HouseExecutive Session Continued
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback