MO HB354 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the law regarding the financial protection of vulnerable populations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the law regarding the financial protection of vulnerable populations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 354 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-02-25HouseTaken Up
2019-02-20HousePerfected (H)
2019-02-20HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-20HouseTaken Up
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-02-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-29HouseReferred: Financial Institutions(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback