MO HB354 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows DWI courts to use private probation and parole services for judicial supervision when the Department of Probation and Parole is unable to provide the services
Title
Allows DWI courts to use private probation and parole services for judicial supervision when the Department of Probation and Parole is unable to provide the services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections(H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB354&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0354I.htm |