MO HB354 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a qualified plug-in electric drive vehicle from the state's motor vehicle emissions inspection program
Title
Exempts a qualified plug-in electric drive vehicle from the state's motor vehicle emissions inspection program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-05-05 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-04-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by the Speaker Pro Tem (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2011-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-06 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |