MO HB345 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of arbitration awards and intervention in court proceedings for insurance companies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of arbitration awards and intervention in court proceedings for insurance companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 345 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 101 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 345 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: HB 345 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 345 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: HB 345 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-29 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-19 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 101 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 21 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 25, 2021, 8:15 am, SCR 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |