MO HB343 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a committee to assess the continuation of the Money Follows the Person Demonstration Program in order to help disabled or aging individuals transition from nursing facilities to community settings
Title
Establishes a committee to assess the continuation of the Money Follows the Person Demonstration Program in order to help disabled or aging individuals transition from nursing facilities to community settings
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lair [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - HB 343 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 153 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 343 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - HB 343 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 343 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - HB 343 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-19 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 156 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass consent |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments Consent (H) - with HCA 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-19 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments Consent (H) - with HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |