MO HB340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sellers of motor vehicles to either make repairs subject to manufacturer's recalls prior to the sale of the vehicle or notify the buyer and Department of Revenue of any deficiencies relating to recall notices so that the recall can be noted on the motor vehicle's certificate of ownership.
Title
Requires sellers of motor vehicles to either make repairs subject to manufacturer's recalls prior to the sale of the vehicle or notify the buyer and Department of Revenue of any deficiencies relating to recall notices so that the recall can be noted on the motor vehicle's certificate of ownership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB340&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0578H.01I.pdf |