MO HB339 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tort claims
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tort claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 339 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 339 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: HB 339 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: HB 339 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: HB 339 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: HB 339 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: HB 339 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-04-26 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS as amended AYES: 103 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2 adopted AYES: 22 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-07 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 103 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to settlement of tort claims |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-29 | House | Prefiled (H) |