MO HB339 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding voter eligibility regarding voter registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding voter eligibility regarding voter registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2015-03-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2015-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-03-04HouseReferred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
2015-03-04HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2015-03-03HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2015-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-02-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-01-27HouseReferred: Elections(H)
2015-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-07HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-12-31HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback