MO HB337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Senior Services Growth and Development Program."
Title
Establishes the "Senior Services Growth and Development Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: HB 337 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 9, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 9:00am, SCR 2 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Continued - Motion to Do Pass Tabled |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-16 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |