MO HB334 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating elections
Title
Modifies several provisions relating elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: HB 334 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: HB 334 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 334 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 334 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: HB 334 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 334 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 334 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 1:00 p.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 14, 1 p.m., SCR 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |