MO HB324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires election authorities to make available at least one electronic voting machine per polling location for blind or visually impaired voters at an election in order to comply with federal law
Title
Requires election authorities to make available at least one electronic voting machine per polling location for blind or visually impaired voters at an election in order to comply with federal law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |