MO HB320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Changes provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: HB 320 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (HA 2 HA 3) (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 116 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 118 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (HA 2 HA 3) (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 116 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 118 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 320 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 13, 9:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 12, 9:00 a.m., SCR 2 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 27, 1:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Re-Perfected (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 2 to HA 3, HA 3 AS AMENDED ADOPTED |
2021-04-13 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - HA 1 to HA 3 AYES: 117 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - HA 3, as amended AYES: 118 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - HCS AYES: 116 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Perfection AYES: 117 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, and HA 3 as amended, adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2021-03-31 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |