MO HB316 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to certain persons found guilty of criminal offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to certain persons found guilty of criminal offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-26HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-22HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-07HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-29HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-08HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-02-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-01HouseReferred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB316&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1085H.01I.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.07H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.08H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1085H01.09H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0316I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1085H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0316C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback