MO HB311 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows public institutions of higher education to charge differential tuition rates based on program of study
Title
Allows public institutions of higher education to charge differential tuition rates based on program of study
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |