MO HB303 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes transfer procedures to nonresident districts for students in public schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes transfer procedures to nonresident districts for students in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-29HouseReturned to Consent Calendar (S)
2021-04-28HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-28HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-07HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-22HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-22HouseAction Postponed (H)
2021-02-22HouseExecutive Session Continued
2021-02-18HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-18HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback