MO HB302 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a Blue Alert System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Blue Alert System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - House: HB 302 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: HB 302 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-12HouseVoted Do Not Pass (H)
2017-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-05-11SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended
2017-05-11SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S)
2017-05-11SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4
2017-05-11SenateTaken Up
2017-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
2017-05-11SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2017-05-11SenateSS Adopted (S)
2017-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2017-05-11SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2017-05-11SenateTaken Up
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, adopted/SA 5, SS for SCS as amended pending
2017-04-24SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2017-04-24SenateTaken Up
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-04-20SenateTaken Up
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-03-09SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-03-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2017-03-09SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 9, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2017-02-23SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2017-02-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-16HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-16HouseTaken Up
2017-02-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-02-14HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-02-14HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-14HouseTaken Up
2017-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback