MO HB3017 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATION BILL
Title
APPROPRIATION BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: HB 3017 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: HB 3017 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2022-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-06 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 140 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, May 3, 2022. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 3, 2022, 9:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 2, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Friday, April 29, 2022. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Thursday, April 28, 2022. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Friday, April 29, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 28, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2022, Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-20 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 21 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2022-04-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |