MO HB297 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]

Summary

Institutions of Higher Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 297 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 297 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 297 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: HB 297 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2021-05-14HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS#2 as amended
2021-05-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-05-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-05-13HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-05-13SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended
2021-05-12SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1. SA 2, SA 1 to SA 3, SA 2 to SA 3, SA 3 as amended, SA 4 AYES: 23 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 1
2021-05-12SenateSS #2 Adopted
2021-05-12SenateSS #2 Offered
2021-05-12SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2021-05-12SenateTaken Up
2021-05-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SS and SA 1 pending
2021-05-10SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2021-05-10SenateTaken Up
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-04-29SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 29, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1
2021-04-27SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2021-04-26SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-26SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-23SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 26, 3:30 p.m. or upon conclusion of Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources, SCR 2
2021-04-20SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-15SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 1 p.m., Senate Lounge
2021-04-15SenateSecond read and referred: Education(S)
2021-04-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-04-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 12
2021-04-13HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-04-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-12HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-04-08HousePerfected (H)
2021-04-08HouseHS Adopted in House (H)
2021-04-08HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-04-08HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-04-07HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-06HouseHS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-06HouseHS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-01HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-30HouseCommitted to: Legislative Review(H)
2021-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-23HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB297&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0921H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0921H.03F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0921H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0921S.07F.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.07H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.08H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.09H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.11H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921H01.12H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0921S07.01F.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0297I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0921H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0297C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/BillTracking/bills211/memsum/HB297ss.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0297P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0921H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0921S.07A.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/052.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/052.001.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/072.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/072.010.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback