MO HB297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner.
Title
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Special Committee on Urban Issues AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |