MO HB297 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the scope of practice for dental hygienists
Title
Expands the scope of practice for dental hygienists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB297&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0966H.01I.pdf |