MO HB297 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Social Services to seek a federal waiver to mandate the use of photo identification for continued eligibility in the food stamp program
Title
Requires the Department of Social Services to seek a federal waiver to mandate the use of photo identification for continued eligibility in the food stamp program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB297&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0297I.htm |