MO HB297 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the crime of abuse of a child to include knowingly inflicting cruel or excessive punishment upon a child younger than 17 years of age or knowingly causing physical injury by any means
Title
Revises the crime of abuse of a child to include knowingly inflicting cruel or excessive punishment upon a child younger than 17 years of age or knowingly causing physical injury by any means
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB297&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0297I.htm |