MO HB295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Peace Officer Basic Training Tuition Reimbursement Program"
Title
Establishes the "Peace Officer Basic Training Tuition Reimbursement Program"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: HB 295 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |