MO HB29 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to intoxicating liquor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to intoxicating liquor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House: HB 29 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: HB 29 (HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HousePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-13HousePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2017-04-11HouseSecond read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S)
2017-04-10HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 5
2017-04-10HouseTaken Up
2017-04-05HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2017-04-05HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-04-05HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to intoxicating liquor
2017-04-05HouseTaken Up
2017-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-09HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-10HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback