MO HB289 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that beginning January 1, 2018, certain shareholders of S corporations may elect to reject workers' compensation insurance coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that beginning January 1, 2018, certain shareholders of S corporations may elect to reject workers' compensation insurance coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - House: HB 289 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: HB 289 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 70 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-21SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 3:00 p.m., Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-21SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Hearing rescheduled
2017-04-20SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, April 21, 2017,8:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-18SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2017-04-13SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2017-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-24SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 9:00 a.m., SCR 1
2017-03-09SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Small Business and Industry(S)
2017-03-02HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-03-02HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-02HouseTaken Up
2017-03-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2017-03-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-28HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-02-27HousePerfected (H)
2017-02-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-27HouseTaken Up
2017-02-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: Special Committee on Employment Security(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback